Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0973535
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
10.07.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
31.01.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.08.2003 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.01.2003 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
17.12.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.12.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.02.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
24.02.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.02.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
11.12.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
11.12.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
06.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.08.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.03.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|