EP0973535 - PROTEIN CRYSTALS, THEIR PREPARATION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRIGGS, Stephen, L. 741 Ironwood Drive Plainfield, IN 46168 / US | 02 /
CLAWSON, David, K. 814 West Main Street Crawfordsville, IN 47933 / US | 03 /
SCHEVITZ, Richard, W. 6053 Halfmoon Lane Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US | 04 /
WERY, Jean-Pierre 11733 Forest Park Lane Carmel, IN 46033 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Faming 12429 Springbrooke Run Carmel, IN 46033 / US | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Denholm, Anna Marie, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Center Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | Denholm, Anna Marie, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited, Lilly Research Center, Erl Wood Manor Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97954604.1 | 19.12.1997 | [2000/04] | WO1997US23669 | Priority number, date | US19960033540P | 20.12.1996 Original published format: US 33540 P | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9827993 | Date: | 02.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0973535 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, C07K14/575 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
C07K14/5759 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/04] | Title | German: | PROTEINKRISTALLE, DEREN HERSTELLING UND VERWENDUNG | [2000/04] | English: | PROTEIN CRYSTALS, THEIR PREPARATION AND USE | [2000/04] | French: | CRISTAUX PROTEIQUES, LEUR PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2000/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.1999 | Search fee paid | 17.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.06.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 01.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/35] | 07.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.02.2000 | 31.12.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9623517 ; | [Y]WO9623515 ; | [A]WO9634111 | [Y] - NATURE, 01 December 1994, Vol. 372, ZHANG et al., "Positional Cloning of the Mouse Obese Gene and its Human Homologue", pages 425-432. | [Y] - J. BIOL. CHEM., 23 February 1996, Vol. 271, No. 8, GONG et al., "Genomic Structure and Promoter Analysis of the Human Obese Gene", pages 3971-3974. | [Y] - BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., 26 April 1995, Vol. 209, No. 3, MURAKAMI et al., "Cloning of Rat Obese cDNA and its Expression in Obese Rats", pages 944-952. | [YP] - ANAL. BIOCHEM., 1997, Vol. 247, COHEN et al., "Mass Spectrometry of Whole Proteins Eluted from Sodium Dodecyl Sulfate-Polyacrylamide Gel Electrophoresis Gels", pages 257-267. | [YP] - NATURE, 08 May 1997, Vol. 387, ZHANG et al., "Crystal Structure of the Obese Protein Leptin-E100", pages 206-209. | [A] - PROTEIN SCIENCE, 1994, Vol. 3, TEPLYAKOV et al., "Crystal Structure of Inorganic Pyrophosphatase from Thermus Thermophilus", pages 1098-1107. |