EP0923420 - BRUSHING PROCESS FOR DESCALING COLD-ROLLED STAINLESS STEEL AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/25] | BRUSHING PROCESS FOR CORROSION AND OXIDATION RESISTANCE | ||
[2002/10] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J & L Specialty Steel, Inc. One PPG Place, P.O. Box 3373 Pittsburgh, PA 15230-3373 / US | [1999/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McGUIRE, Michael, F. 1090 Fox Chapel Road Pittsburgh, PA 15009 / US | 02 /
PRICE, Lee 218 Edgewood Drive East Beaver, PA 15009 / US | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Eveleens Maarse, Pieter Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Eveleens Maarse, Pieter Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1999/25] | Eveleens Maarse, Pieter Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 97954639.7 | 29.12.1997 | [1999/25] | WO1997US24048 | Priority number, date | US19960034501 | 26.12.1996 Original published format: US 34501 | US19970900697 | 25.07.1997 Original published format: US 900697 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9829205 | Date: | 09.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0923420 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.07.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B21B45/04, C21D8/02, B24B27/033, B24D13/10 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
B24B27/033 (EP);
B24D13/10 (EP);
C21D8/0205 (EP);
C21D8/0242 (EP);
B21B3/02 (EP);
B21B45/04 (EP);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/25] | Title | German: | BÜRSTVERFAHREN ZUR OXIDBESEITIGUNG AUF KALTGEWALZTEM ROSTFREIEM STAHL UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2002/10] | English: | BRUSHING PROCESS FOR DESCALING COLD-ROLLED STAINLESS STEEL AND APPARATUS THEREFOR | [2002/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE BROSSAGE POUR LE DECAPAGE D'ACIER INOXYDABLE LAMINE A FROID ET DISPOSITIF POUR CETTE METHODE | [2002/10] |
Former [1999/25] | BÜRSTVERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES KORROSIONS- UND OXYDATIONSWIDERSTANDES | ||
Former [1999/25] | BRUSHING PROCESS FOR CORROSION AND OXIDATION RESISTANCE | ||
Former [1999/25] | PROCEDE DE BROSSAGE AMELIORANT LA RESISTANCE A LA CORROSION ET A L'OXYDATION | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.1998 | Search fee paid | 25.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 22.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/01] | 02.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19505324 (BWG BERGWERK WALZWERK [DE]) [X] 1,5,6,11,13,15 * column 1, line 1 - line 37; figure .; claims 1,7,8,12 * * column 3, line 13 - line 30 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 10 * [A] 2,4,7,10,14; | [A]JPH07316662 ; | [A]EP0695808 (BWG BERGWERK WALZWERK [DE]) [A] 1,4,11,14 * column 4, line 30 - line 51; figure .; claims 1,11 *; | [A]JPS59197524 ; | [A]JPH0824904 ; | [A]EP0666143 (HOTANI KK [JP]) [A] 1,9,11 * abstract * * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 2 *; | [A]EP0299636 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 8,16 * column 4, line 48 - line 54; figure 1 * * column 5, line 27 - line 44 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 096, no. 004, & JP07316662 A 19951205 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD) [A] 1,2,11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850326), vol. 009, no. 066, Database accession no. (C - 271), & JP59197524 A 19841109 (NITSUSHIN SEIKOU KK) [A] 1,8,11,16 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 096, no. 005, & JP08024904 A 19960130 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD) [A] 1,11 * abstract * | International search | [X]US4824536 (KIM YEONG-U [US], et al); | [Y]US4406761 (SHIMOGORI KAZUTOSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5554235 (NOE ROLF [DE], et al); | [A]US4751760 (NOROTA SUSUMU [JP]); | [A]US4872245 (KAWASAKI YOSHIKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2907151 (PETERSON RUBEN O); | [A]US5131126 (KATSUKI YASUHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US2318432 (STANIER JOHN S, et al); | [A]JPS55133802 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) |