EP0946602 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE CONTINUOUS COAGULATION OF AQUEOUS DISPERSIONS OF GRAFT RUBBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÜNTHERBERG, Norbert Nachtigallenweg 44 D-67346 Speyer / DE | 02 /
HOFMANN, Jürgen Münschbuschweg 30c D-67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner, et al Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Ludwigsplatz 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr., et al Patentanwälte, Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner, Ludwigsplatz 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97954751.0 | 23.12.1997 | [1999/40] | WO1997EP07261 | Priority number, date | DE1996154169 | 23.12.1996 Original published format: DE 19654169 | [1999/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9828344 | Date: | 02.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0946602 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0946602 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08F6/22, B01F5/16 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
C08F6/22 (EP,KR,US);
B01F27/2711 (EP,KR,US);
B01F33/81 (EP,US);
B01F33/811 (EP,KR,US);
B29B7/402 (EP,US);
B29B7/408 (EP);
B29B7/7495 (EP,US);
C08F265/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08F279/02 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S528/936 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN KOAGULATION VON WÄSSRIGEN PFROPFKAUTSCHUKDISPERSIONEN UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [1999/40] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE CONTINUOUS COAGULATION OF AQUEOUS DISPERSIONS OF GRAFT RUBBERS | [1999/40] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIFS POUR LA COAGULATION EN CONTINU DE DISPERSIONS AQUEUSES DE CAOUTCHOUCS GREFFES | [1999/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 01.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3617720 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 4, line 5 - line 6 *; | [A]US4299952 (PINGEL RONALD J, et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US4831116 (HENTON DAVID E [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [X]EP0344399 (JANKE & KUNKEL KG [DE]) [X] 10 * abstract *; | [X]US2619330 (PETER WILLEMS) [X] 10 * figure -; claim - * |