blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0853030

EP0853030 - Apparatus and method of controlling fluid flow between a plurality of vehicle components [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.12.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ITT AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRICAL SYSTEMS, INC.
3000 University Drive
Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2356 / US
[1998/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Buschur, Jeffrey J.
4068 Shadowleaf Dreive
Bellbrook, Ohio 45305 / US
02 / Hill, John S.
227 W. Siebenthaler Avenue
Dayton, Ohio 45405 / US
[1998/29]
Representative(s)DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/18]Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1998/29]Portwich, Peter
c/o ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date98100087.007.01.1998
[1998/29]
Priority number, dateUS1997078045708.01.1997         Original published format: US 780457
[1998/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0853030
Date:15.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0853030
Date:22.03.2000
[2000/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.02.2000
ClassificationIPC:B62D5/07, F01P7/04
[1998/29]
CPC:
F01P7/044 (EP,US); B62D5/07 (EP,US); F01P7/048 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/48]
Former [1998/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Steuerung von Druckmittelströmungen zwischen einer Mehrzahl von Fahrzeugkomponenten[1998/29]
English:Apparatus and method of controlling fluid flow between a plurality of vehicle components[1998/29]
French:Appareil et procédé pour contrôler un courant de fluide entre plusieurs composants d'un véhicule[1998/29]
Examination procedure22.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
10.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2003Fee for grant paid
30.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/07]
04.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4446697  (GOSCENSKI JR EDWARD J [US]) [A] 1,15,21,22,27,34 * column 3, line 26 - column 10, line 18; figure - *;
 [A]DE4340873  (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH [DE]) [A] 27,34,41 * column 3, line 65 - column 7, line 60; figure - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.