EP0852999 - Sound absorbing article and method of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG Industries Ohio, Inc. 3800 West 143rd Street Cleveland, OH 44111 / US | [1999/27] |
Former [1998/29] | For all designated states PPG INDUSTRIES, INC. One PPG Place Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15272 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benson, Vernon C., Jr. 249 Mohawk Drive Arnold, Pennsylvania 15068 / US | 02 /
Freemen, Glenn E. 1110 Park Street Tarentum, Pennsylvania 15084 / US | [1998/29] | Representative(s) | polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/29] | Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 98100104.3 | 07.01.1998 | [1998/29] | Priority number, date | US19970783596 | 13.01.1997 Original published format: US 783596 | [1998/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0852999 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0852999 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10, C03C27/12, B60J1/00 | [1998/29] | CPC: |
B32B17/10302 (EP,US);
B32B17/04 (KR);
B32B17/10018 (EP,US);
B32B17/10036 (EP,US);
B32B17/10761 (EP,US);
B32B17/1077 (EP,US);
B32B17/10788 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B32B17/10005, B32B2367/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1999/50] |
Former [1998/29] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Geräuschdämmender Gegenstand und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1998/29] | English: | Sound absorbing article and method of making same | [1998/29] | French: | Article insonorisante et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1998/29] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 24.02.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/13] | 27.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPS6237148 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD, et al) [AD] 1,9,12*Abstract*; | [X]DE8910916U (VEGLA, VEREINIGTE GLASWERKE GMBH) [X] 1,2,4,5,18 * page 8, paragraph 2; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0457190 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,21,22 * page 5, line 17 - line 41 *; | [X]EP0532478 (SIV SOC ITALIANA VETRO [IT]) [X] 1,13,18 * claim 1 *; | [AD]EP0566890 (SEIKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1,9,21,22 * page 2, line 56 - page 3, line 1 * * page 12, line 51 - line 58 * * page 3, line 46 - page 4, line 9 *; | [AP]EP0763420 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [AP] 6,15-19 * page 5, line 34 - line 48 * * page 6, line 9 - line 15; figures 1,2 *; | [E]WO9826927 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [E] 1-20 * page 3, line 1 - page 5, line 24 * * page 7, line 1 - page 9, line 8 * * page 13, line 6 - page 15, line 16; figure -; claim - * |