EP0855253 - Kitchen appliance to cut matter, in particular fruits, vegetables or potatoes, into slices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.2002 [2002/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfred Börner Kunststoff- und Metallwarenfabrik GmbH Industriegebiet 54526 Niederkail / DE | [1998/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Börner, Jürgen Neustrasse 20 54526 Niederkail / DE | [1998/31] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98100296.7 | 09.01.1998 | [1998/31] | Priority number, date | DE1997200883U | 20.01.1997 Original published format: DE 29700883 U | [1998/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0855253 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0855253 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | [1999/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0855253 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B26B3/03 | [1998/31] | CPC: |
B26D1/25 (EP);
B26D3/283 (EP);
B26D7/2614 (EP);
B26D2003/285 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GR, IT, LI, NL [2000/24] |
Former [1998/31] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Küchengerät zum Schneiden von Gut, insbesondere Obst, Gemüse oder Kartoffeln in Scheiben | [1998/31] | English: | Kitchen appliance to cut matter, in particular fruits, vegetables or potatoes, into slices | [1998/31] | French: | Dispositif de cuisine pour couper des matières, en particulier des fruits, légumes ou pommes de terre, en tranches | [1998/31] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 30.03.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, ES, FI, GB, PT, SE | 28.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.05.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE537437 (ERICH KURTH) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB657683 (NORMAN GARDNER) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9418421U (WMF WUERTTEMBERG METALLWAREN [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE590101 (PAUL KUEHNEL) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]CH230043 (WAEFLER ALBERT [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |