EP0853981 - Method for preparing and processing a two-component composition and mill for carrying out the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scheiff GmbH Arloffer Strasse 148 53881 Euskirchen / DE | [1998/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hille, Albrecht, Dr. Maarweg 13 52076 Aachen / DE | [1998/30] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1998/30] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 98100341.1 | 10.01.1998 | [1998/30] | Priority number, date | DE1997101279 | 16.01.1997 Original published format: DE 19701279 | DE1997138662 | 04.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19738662 | [1998/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0853981 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B05C9/10, B29B7/74, B01F5/06 | [1998/30] | CPC: |
B29B7/401 (EP);
B01F25/40 (EP);
B29B7/407 (EP);
B29B7/80 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/14] |
Former [1998/30] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Bereitstellen und Verarbeiten einer Zweikomponentenmasse und Mühle zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1998/30] | English: | Method for preparing and processing a two-component composition and mill for carrying out the method | [1998/30] | French: | Procédé de preparation et de traitement d'une composition à deux constituants et broyeur pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé | [1998/30] | Examination procedure | 23.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/47] | 22.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2835249 (UPAT MAX LANGENSIEPEN KG) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 28-31 *; | [Y]DE3151664 (UPAT MAX LANGENSIEPEN KG [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * figure 1; claim - *; | [A]DE3202915 (WALDNER GMBH & CO HERMANN [DE]) [A] 6* figure 1 *; | [Y]GB2168261 (DOWTY GROUP SERVICES) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * claims 1,9 * |