EP0856264 - Slider of slide fastener with automatic locking mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.04.2003 [2003/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YKK Corporation No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | For all designated states YKK CORPORATION No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizuno, Hiroshi 15-27, Yotsuba-cho Toyama-shi, Toyama-ken / JP | [1998/32] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98100354.4 | 12.01.1998 | [1998/32] | Priority number, date | JP19970018535 | 31.01.1997 Original published format: JP 1853597 | [1998/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0856264 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0856264 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A44B19/30 | [1998/32] | CPC: |
A44B19/306 (EP,US);
A44B19/30 (KR);
A44B19/26 (KR);
Y10T24/2571 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/16] |
Former [1998/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Automatisch verriegelbarer Schieber für Reissverschluss | [1998/32] | English: | Slider of slide fastener with automatic locking mechanism | [1998/32] | French: | Curseur à verrouillage automatique pour fermeture à glissière | [1998/32] | Examination procedure | 05.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 06.02.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 25.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.03.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.03.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0745338 (YKK CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0612486 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4139928 (AOKI TSUNETAKA, et al) [A] 1 * abstract * |