EP0857802 - Flat bed knitting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H. Stoll GmbH & Co. Stollweg 1 72760 Reutlingen / DE | [2004/08] |
Former [1998/33] | For all designated states H. Stoll GmbH & Co. Stollweg 1 D-72760 Reutlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmid, Franz Eichenweg 20 72411 Bodelshausen / DE | 02 /
Götz, Gerhard Bruno-Matzke-Strasse 27 72770 Reutlingen / DE | [1998/33] | Representative(s) | Möbus, Daniela Patentanwältin Dr. Möbus Kaiserstrasse 85 72764 Reutlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/33] | Möbus, Daniela, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Rudolf Möbus, Dr.-Ing. Daniela Möbus, Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Schwan, Hindenburgstrasse 65 72762 Reutlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98100578.8 | 15.01.1998 | [1998/33] | Priority number, date | DE1997104644 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19704644 | [1998/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0857802 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0857802 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0857802 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D04B15/06 | [1998/33] | CPC: |
D04B15/362 (EP,US);
D04B15/06 (EP,US);
D04B15/90 (EP);
D04B7/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, IT [2000/03] |
Former [1998/33] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flachstrickmaschine | [1998/33] | English: | Flat bed knitting machine | [1998/33] | French: | Métier à tricoter rectiligne | [1998/33] | Examination procedure | 22.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3609539 (STOLL & CO H [DE]); | [DA]DE3935763 (STOLL & CO H [DE]); | [DA]DE4128016 (STOLL & CO H [DE]); | [A]EP0567282 (TSUDAKOMA IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7 * column 8, line 11 - line 24; figure 11 *; | [XA]EP0578458 (SHIMA SEIKI MFG [JP]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * column 3, line 57 - column 6, line 44; figures 1-12 * [A] 11; | [PX]DE19531960 (SCHIEBER UNIVERSAL MASCHF [DE]) [PX] 1,2 * figure 1; claims 1,2 * |