EP0845671 - Electron capture detector with guard electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Varian, Inc. 3120 Hansen Way Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2000/22] |
Former [1998/23] | For all designated states VARIAN ASSOCIATES, INC. 3100 Hansen Way Palo Alto, California 94304-1030 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simon, Richard K., Jr. 3946 Parrot Cove College Station, Texas 77845 / US | [1998/23] | Representative(s) | Cline, Roger Ledlie EDWARD EVANS BARKER Clifford's Inn, Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/23] | Cline, Roger Ledlie EDWARD EVANS & CO. Chancery House 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98100605.9 | 16.06.1995 | [1998/23] | Priority number, date | US19940261573 | 17.06.1994 Original published format: US 261573 | [1998/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0845671 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0845671 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/66, G01N30/70 | [1998/23] | CPC: |
G01N27/66 (EP,US);
G01N30/70 (EP,US);
G01N2030/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1998/23] | Title | German: | Elektroneneinfang-Detektor mit Schutzelektrode | [1998/23] | English: | Electron capture detector with guard electrode | [1998/23] | French: | Détecteur à capture d'électrons avec électrode de garde | [1998/23] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/23] | 11.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95304212.4 / EP0687906 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5791449 ; | [AD]US4117332 (FELTON JOHN ROBERT, et al) [AD] 1* column W *; | [A]US4651008 (WELLS GREGORY J [US]) [A] 1 * column W * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820909), vol. 006, no. 175, Database accession no. (P - 141), & JP57091449 A 19820607 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |