EP0930575 - Method to convert dates in six- or seven-digit format into dates in eight-digit format, including two digits for the century, and methods for packing and unpacking such eight-digit dates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bohm, Anker Kaltoft Lerager 47 3600 Frederikssund / DK | [1999/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Roerboel, Leif, et al Budde Schou A/S Hausergade 3 1128 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | Roerboel, Leif, et al BUDDE, SCHOU & CO. A/S, Vestergade 31 1456 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 98100668.7 | 16.01.1998 | [1999/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0930575 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, G06F9/44 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
G06F8/78 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Konvertieren von Daten in sechs- oder siebenziffrigem Format in Daten in achtziffrigem Format, einschliesslich zwei Ziffern für das Jahrhundert, und Verfahren zum Einpacken und Auspacken solcher achtziffrigen Daten | [1999/29] | English: | Method to convert dates in six- or seven-digit format into dates in eight-digit format, including two digits for the century, and methods for packing and unpacking such eight-digit dates | [1999/29] | French: | Méthode pour convertir des dates en format à six ou sept chiffres en dates en format à huit chiffres, incluant deux chiffres pour le siècle, et méthodes pour emballer et déballer de telles dates à huit chiffres | [1999/29] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4141005 (BONNER BRUCE R ET AL) [A] 2-5 * abstract * * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 11; figures 2-4 * * column 10, line 30 - column 13, line 10; figures 7A-7D,8A-8D *; | [A]WO9733240 (ADAMCHICK J DAVID) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * page 7, line 11 - page 8, line 10 * * page 8, line 16 - page 9, line 31 * * claim - *; | [DX] - The Year 2000 and 2-Digit Dates: A Guide for Planning and Implementation (GC28-1251-06), POUGHKEEPSIE, NY, USA, INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION, (199704), XP002069421 [DX] 1-5 * Chapter 5. Reformatting Year-Date Notation; page 5.6, line 24 - page 5.9, line 7 * * page 5.10, line 23 - line 30 * * page 5.13, line 29 - line L * | [X] - SCHOLTEN H ET AL, "2000-MOOI BEGIN OF ONVERHOOPT EIND?", INFORMATIE, (19951201), pages 810 - 813, XP000570985 [X] 1-5 * page 812, column R, line 31 - line 45 * | [A] - CHUNGTI LIANG ET AL, "Techniques for addressing the Year 2000 transition", PROCEEDINGS TWENTY-FIRST ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL COMPUTER SOFTWARE AND APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE COMPSAC'97, (CAT. NO.97CB36112), WASHINGTON, DC, US, ISBN 0-8186-8105-5, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA, IEEE COMPUT. SOC, USA, (19970813), pages 444 - 447, XP002069353 [A] 1-5 * page 446, column L, line 11 - line 30 * |