EP0858941 - Drive for a steering column [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO Sicherheitssysteme GmbH Waldstrasse 2 85253 Erdweg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states VALEO Sicherheitssysteme Waldstrasse 2 85253 Erdweg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thiele, Christoph Rudolf Camerloherstrasse 63 80686 München / DE | 02 /
Rosien, Harald Enzieanstrasse 7 82194 Groebenzell / DE | [1998/34] | Representative(s) | Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wissgott Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | COHAUSZ DAWIDOWICZ HANNIG & SOZIEN Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1998/34] | COHAUSZ HANNIG DAWIDOWICZ & PARTNER Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 98101024.2 | 22.01.1998 | [1998/34] | Priority number, date | DE1997105203 | 12.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19705203 | [1998/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0858941 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0858941 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | [1998/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0858941 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/18 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
B62D1/181 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/33] |
Former [1998/34] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Antrieb für eine Lenksäule | [1998/34] | English: | Drive for a steering column | [1998/34] | French: | Entraînement pour une colonne de direction | [1998/34] | Examination procedure | 20.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/24] | 12.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5178411 (FEVRE LAURENT [FR], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * column 5, line 17 - line 58; figure 4 * [A] 2,6,7,9 |