Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0855561
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
20.02.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] |
28.02.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] |
13.02.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.01.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.09.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
06.09.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.06.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
10.05.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.03.2002 |
First examination report |
|
01.03.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.02.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.02.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.08.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
16.06.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 02.08.2000 [2000/31] |
02.06.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.07.2000 [2000/29] |
11.02.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.10.1999 |
Publication of search report |
published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] |
12.06.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] |
18.02.1998 |
Change - extension states |
|