Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0855561 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2003 | B1 | EP0855561 | 24.11.1999 | A3 | EP0855561 | 29.07.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19702686 | 25.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19702686 | 30.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19702686 | 25.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59807908D1 | 22.05.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19702686 | 25.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2197389T | 01.01.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE19702686 | 25.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT855561E | 29.08.2003 | E | Priority number | Date | DE19702686 | 25.01.1997 |