EP0855561 - Gas fired water heater [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1998/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Sousa, Mario Pais Estrade de Cacia 3800 Aveiro / PT | 02 /
Seebauer, Manfred Estrada de Cacia 3800 Aveiro / PT | [1998/31] | Application number, filing date | 98101037.4 | 22.01.1998 | [1998/31] | Priority number, date | DE1997102686 | 25.01.1997 Original published format: DE 19702686 | [1998/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0855561 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0855561 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0855561 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F24H9/20 | [1998/31] | CPC: |
F24H9/2035 (EP,US);
F24H15/174 (EP,US);
F24H15/31 (EP,US);
F24H15/36 (EP,US);
F24H15/395 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT [2000/31] |
Former [1998/31] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gasbeheizter Warmwasserbereiter | [1998/31] | English: | Gas fired water heater | [1998/31] | French: | Chauffe-eau à gaz | [1998/31] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 05.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2332267 (GNI I PI GIPRONIIGAS) [A] 1* page 8, paragraph L *; | [A]DE8901428U (JOH. VAILLANT GMBH U. CO.) [A] 1 * figure .; claim . *; | [A]CH681322 (VAILLANT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | - Firmenprospekt, Junkers - Bosch Gruppe, Leistungsgesteuerte Gas-Warmwasserthermen mit Batteriezündung WR 275-1, WR 350-1, WR 400-1 K..B.. für Schornsteinanschluss, SK 1-6.206 (9.95) |