EP0856707 - Process and device for humidifying air [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states adsotherm GmbH, Separationstechnik Hundemstrasse 25 57368 Lennestadt / DE | [1998/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmelzer, Robert Arnoldistrasse 44 57361 Lennestadt / DE | [1998/32] | Representative(s) | Valentin, Ekkehard Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98101117.4 | 23.01.1998 | [1998/32] | Priority number, date | DE1997103793 | 01.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19703793 | DE1997103794 | 01.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19703794 | [1998/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0856707 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0856707 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F24F3/14, B01D53/26, B01D53/06 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
F24F3/1423 (EP);
B01D53/06 (EP);
B01D53/261 (EP);
F24F3/1411 (EP);
B01D2257/80 (EP);
B01D2259/4009 (EP);
F24F2003/144 (EP);
F24F2203/1004 (EP);
F24F2203/1012 (EP);
F24F2203/1032 (EP);
F24F2203/1052 (EP);
F24F2203/1068 (EP);
F24F2203/1084 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/32] | F24F3/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Entfeuchtung von Luft | [1998/32] | English: | Process and device for humidifying air | [1998/32] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour humidifier de l'air | [1998/32] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/10] | 10.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4589892 (LEONARD DAVID M [US]) [A] 1-3,8 * column 8, line 41 - line 68; figures 4,5 *; | [AD]DE4414061 (KRONAUER GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,4-7 * the whole document *; | [A]GB957066 (CONDITAIRE LTD) | by applicant | JPS61252497 | DE4414061 |