EP0855666 - Finger verification system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.1999 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Yasuo 2-5-10, Seya, Seya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Aizawa, Masami 2-17-39-504, Tsurumichyuou, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Kimura, Takuji 3-2-7-227, Namiki, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1998/31] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98101194.3 | 23.01.1998 | [1998/31] | Priority number, date | JP19970010526 | 23.01.1997 Original published format: JP 1052697 | [1998/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0855666 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0855666 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, A61B5/117, G07C9/00 | [1998/31] | CPC: |
G07C9/37 (EP,US);
G06V40/1335 (US);
G06V40/1306 (US);
G06V40/15 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fingerprüfungssystem | [1998/31] | English: | Finger verification system | [1998/31] | French: | Système de verification des doigts | [1998/31] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/31] | 24.08.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3781855 (KILLEN D) [Y] 6-10 * abstract *; | [X]US4467545 (SHAW JR FREDERIC A [US]) [X] 10 * abstract *; | [A]US4857916 (BELLIN ROBERT W [US]) [A] 1,5-11,13; | [A]EP0387522 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,5,13 * abstract *; | [AY]US5546471 (MERJANIAN JOHN M [US]) [A] 1,5,11,13 * abstract * * column 5, line 4 - line 9 * * column 7, line 46 - column 8, line 24 * * column 11, line 23 - line 51 * [Y] 6-10; | [A]EP0735502 (TRW INC [US]) |