EP0866633 - ATM switching apparatus and ATM communications network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/39] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Satoshi c/o Fujitsu Limited, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Yoshihiro c/o Fujitsu Limited, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 03 /
Ueki, Kohei c/o Fujitsu Limited, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | [1998/39] | Representative(s) | von Fischern, Bernhard, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/39] | von Fischern, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann - Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98101380.8 | 27.01.1998 | [1998/39] | Priority number, date | JP19970063642 | 17.03.1997 Original published format: JP 6364297 | [1998/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0866633 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0866633 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
H04L45/26 (EP,US);
H04L45/10 (EP,US);
H04L45/22 (EP,US);
H04L49/255 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5615 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/14] |
Former [1998/39] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ATM-Vermittlungseinrichtung und ATM-Kommunikationsnetz | [1998/39] | English: | ATM switching apparatus and ATM communications network | [1998/39] | French: | Dispositif de commutation ATM et réseau de communication ATM | [1998/39] | Examination procedure | 18.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 27.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/04] | 07.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0673138 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,3 * column 15, line 1 - line 23 * * column 17, line 29 - line 47 *; | [XAY]WO9702685 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP], et al) [X] 13 [A] 2,4-11 [Y] 1,3; | EP0785652 [ ] (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [ ] * figures 19-22 * * page 2, line 5 - line 11 * * page 5, line 18 - line 46 * * page 10, line 53 - page 12, line 17 *; | [X] - THE ATM FORUM TECHNICAL COMMITTEE, PRIVATE NETWORK-NETWORK INTERFACE SPECIFICATION VERSION 1.0 (PNNI 1.0), retrieved from Internet: < URL: ftp://ftp.atmforum.com/pub/approved-specs/af-pnni-0055.000.pdf > 25 May 1999,, (199603), XP002103695 [X] 12 * figure 6.1 * * page 173 * * page 210, line 3 - line 18 * * page 211, line 11 - line 32 * * page 221, line 11 - line 15 * |