blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0858239

EP0858239 - Mobile communication system having cordless handy phone unit as mobile station [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  09.05.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 25.06.2003  [2003/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Electronics Corporation
1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/18]For all designated states
NEC Electronics Corporation
1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP
Former [1998/33]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tsujita, Shigeru, c/o NEC IC Microcomp.Syst., Ltd.
403-53, Kosugimachi 1-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[1998/33]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/33]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
Application number, filing date98101557.129.01.1998
[1998/33]
Priority number, dateJP1997001688730.01.1997         Original published format: JP 1688797
[1998/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0858239
Date:12.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0858239
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:H04Q7/38, H04B7/26
[1998/33]
CPC:
H04W48/20 (EP,US); H04W68/00 (EP,US); H04W88/06 (EP,US);
H04W52/0216 (EP,US); H04W84/105 (EP,US); Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2000/39]
Former [1998/33]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Mobiles Kommunikationssystem mit drahtloser Telefoneinheit als Mobilstation[1998/33]
English:Mobile communication system having cordless handy phone unit as mobile station[1998/33]
French:Système de communication mobile avec téléphone sans fil comme station mobile[1998/33]
Examination procedure15.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
28.04.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
18.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9423527  (CELCORE LP [US]) [X] 1 * page 11, line 1 - page 13, line 1 * * page 20, line 26 - page 22, line 29; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,5,6;
 [XA]WO9316549  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 7, line 5 - line 29 * * page 9, line 21 - page 12, line 31 * * page 16, line 30 - page 17, line 6 * * page 19, line 1 - page 20, line 33; figures 2,5,10 * [A] 5,6
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.