EP0856666 - Liquid delivery device, method of controlling such liquid delivery device, and liquid delivery pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states EBARA DENSAN LTD. 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states EBARA DENSAN LTD. 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Shigekazu 1-25, Shinmei-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Ikegami, Tetsuma No.3205-526, 3-2-3, Shiomidai, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Sobukawa, Hiroshi 1-9-22-304, Inari Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Aiyoshizawa, Shun-ichi 1-8-1-204, Nakamagome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Nakazawa, Toshiharu 1-1, Hibarigaoka Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 06 /
Ojima, Yoshinori Hills-Kamakura-Tamanawa-602, 4-258-1, Tamanawa Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1998/34] |
Former [1998/32] | 01 /
Yamamoto, Shigekazu 1-25, Shinmei-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Ikegami, Tetsuma No.5205-526, 3-2-3, Shiomidai, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Sobukawa, Hiroshi 1-9-22-304, Inari Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Aiyoshizawa, Shun-ichi 1-8-1-204, Nakamagome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
05 /
Nakazawa, Toshiharu 1-1, Hibarigaoka Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
06 /
Ojima, Yoshinori Hills-Kamakura-Tamanawa-602, 4-258-1, Tamanawa Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/32] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98101618.1 | 30.01.1998 | [1998/32] | Priority number, date | JP19970032907 | 31.01.1997 Original published format: JP 3290797 | JP19980023925 | 21.01.1998 Original published format: JP 2392598 | [1998/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0856666 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0856666 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F04D3/02, F04D13/06, F04D15/00 | [1998/32] | CPC: |
F04D13/0646 (EP,US);
F04D15/0066 (EP,US);
F04D29/048 (EP,US);
F04D3/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/16] |
Former [1998/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsabgabepumpe und Verfahren zu ihrer Kontrolle | [1998/32] | English: | Liquid delivery device, method of controlling such liquid delivery device, and liquid delivery pump | [1998/32] | French: | Pompe à liquide et procédé de régulation d'une telle pompe | [1998/32] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5046666 (ONO TUNEO [JP]) [Y] 1,3-5,10,6 * abstract * * column 4, line 53 - line 68 *; | [YA]FR2165633 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG) [Y] 6 * page 1, line 1 - line 10 * * page 1, line 35 - line 37 * * page 2, line 25 - page 5, line 10; figure . * [A] 2,8,9; | [A]JPS61266248 ; | [A]WO9119103 (NU TECH IND INC [US]) [A] 2,6,9 * abstract *; | [A]US3846045 (MINCUZZI A) [A] 7 * abstract *; | [A]WO8803993 (TURBANISCH HEINZ [DE]) | [YA] - "FLUID FILM SUPPORTS AND PUMPS", EUREKA (INC. ENGINEERING MATERIALS AND DESIGN), (19911101), vol. 11, no. 11, page 19, XP000306793 [Y] 1,3-5,10 * page 19 * [A] 2 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870418), vol. 011, no. 125, Database accession no. (M - 582), & JP61266248 A 19861125 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 3-5 * abstract * | [A] - INSTRUMENTS & CONTROL SYSTEMS, RADNOR,PENNSYLVANIA USA, (198301), vol. 56, no. 1, pages 41 - 43, XP002064424 [A] 3-5 * page 41, column L * |