EP0857593 - Air conditioning device for the vehicle compartment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | [2004/48] |
Former [1998/33] | For all designated states Hella KG Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brammer, Rüdiger Am Gurgeskamp 12 59558 Lippstadt / DE | 02 /
Knittel, Otto Grabbeweg 3 59494 Soest / DE | [1998/33] | Application number, filing date | 98101705.6 | 02.02.1998 | [1998/33] | Priority number, date | DE1997104254 | 05.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19704254 | [1998/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0857593 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0857593 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0857593 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [1998/33] | CPC: |
G05D23/1902 (EP,US);
B60H1/00642 (EP,US);
B60H1/00849 (EP);
F24F11/30 (EP);
F24F2011/0002 (EP);
F24F2110/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/48] |
Former [1998/33] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Klimaanlage für den Innenraum eines Fahrzeuges | [1998/33] | English: | Air conditioning device for the vehicle compartment | [1998/33] | French: | Dispositif de climatisation pour l'habitacle d'un véhicule | [1998/33] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 01.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3836596 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 42 - line 49 * * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 17 * * column 4, line 19 - line 55 * * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 19 * * column 7, line 44 - line 55 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5427313 (DAVIS JR LEIGHTON I [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 20 - line 51 * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 23 * * column 4, line 19 - line 48 * * column 7, line 12 - line 16 * * column 8, line 45 - line 64 * * column 9, line 38 - line 55 * * figures 1,2,16 *; | [A]DE4214702 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 4 * column 1, line 1 - line 26 * * column 2, line 13 - line 29 * * column 4, line 35 - line 41 * * column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 29 * |