EP0870865 - Shoe press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2002 | Application refused | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2000/51] |
Former [1999/33] | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Papiertechnik Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Papiermaschinen GmbH Postfach 19 70 89509 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schiel, Christian Kandinskyweg 8 82418 Murnau / DE | 02 /
Grabscheid, Joachim, Dr. Obere Dorfstrasse 7 89547 Heuchlingen / DE | 03 /
Schuwerk, Wolfgang Immenriederstrasse 1 88353 Kisslegg / DE | 04 /
Hasenfuss, Rudolf Siebenbürgenstrasse 23 89542 Herbrechtingen / DE | [1998/42] | Application number, filing date | 98101781.7 | 03.02.1998 | [1998/42] | Priority number, date | DE1997114939 | 10.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19714939 | [1998/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0870865 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0870865 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | [1999/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D21F3/02 | [1998/42] | CPC: |
D21F3/0218 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, SE [1999/42] |
Former [1998/42] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schuhpresseinheit | [1998/42] | English: | Shoe press | [1998/42] | French: | Patin de pressage | [1998/42] | Examination procedure | 10.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/42] | 19.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3336462 (VALMET OY [FI]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4425915 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5167768 (CRONIN DENNIS C [US], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [PA]US5650048 (SWIETLIK FRANCIS X [US]) |