EP0858117 - Cathode for lithium secondary battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2007/42] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | ||
Former [1998/33] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishida, Yasunori 2-13-10-201, Amakubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | 02 /
Kami, Kenichiro 1-10-1-201, Takasu-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi / JP | 03 /
Nakane, Kenji 2-13-1-4-103, Umezono Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | 04 /
Miura, Hitoshi 2-13-1-2-101, Umezono Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | [1998/33] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/33] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98101904.5 | 04.02.1998 | [1998/33] | Priority number, date | JP19970022471 | 05.02.1997 Original published format: JP 2247197 | [1998/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0858117 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0858117 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/62, H01M10/40, H01M10/38 | [1998/33] | CPC: |
H01M4/13 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/139 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/62 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2004/028 (KR);
H01M4/131 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/17] |
Former [1998/33] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kathode für Lithiumsekundärbatterie | [1998/33] | English: | Cathode for lithium secondary battery | [1998/33] | French: | Cathode pour pile secondaire au lithium | [1998/33] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 27.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 17.10.2007 | DE | 18.01.2008 | IT | 29.02.2008 | [2011/27] |
Former [2008/48] | NL | 17.10.2007 | |
DE | 18.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | NL | 17.10.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH07296847 ; | [A]JPH0562662 ; | [A]JPH07335228 ; | [A]EP0201875 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [A] 1-7* claims 1-30 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 096, no. 003, & JP07296847 A 19951110 (FUJI ELELCTROCHEM CO LTD) [DA] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930714), vol. 017, no. 375, Database accession no. (E - 1397), & JP05062662 A 19930312 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 096, no. 004, & JP07335228 A 19951222 (A T BATTERY:KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |