EP0857569 - Method and apparatus for preparing printed adhesive stickers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.1999 [1999/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ritter & Co. Robert-Bosch-Strasse 4a 64319 Pfungstadt / DE | [1998/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ritter, Johannes A. Frankensteiner Strasse 44 64342 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | [1998/33] | Representative(s) | Zinngrebe, Horst Saalbaustrasse 11 64283 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/33] | Zinngrebe, Horst, Dr.rer.nat. Saalbaustrasse 11 64283 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 98102076.1 | 06.02.1998 | [1998/33] | Priority number, date | DE1997104450 | 06.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19704450 | [1998/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0857569 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B31D1/02, B41M3/00, B05C9/14 | [1998/33] | CPC: |
B41M3/00 (EP);
B31D1/021 (EP);
B31D1/027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/17] |
Former [1998/33] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von bedruckten Haftzetteln | [1998/33] | English: | Method and apparatus for preparing printed adhesive stickers | [1998/33] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la fabrication des étiquettes adhésives | [1998/33] | Examination procedure | 13.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/51] | 15.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.04.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.04.1999 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]NL7019018 (BAARTMANS) [X] 1,3-34 * figure 1 * [Y] 2; | [X]GB1029856 (.H.BRADY CO.) [X] 1,3-34 * figure 6 *; | [X]EP0628405 (INSTANCE DAVID JOHN) [X] 1,3-34 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US3827355 (HAMISCH P) [Y] 2 * column 4, line 25 - line 53; figure 8 *; | [A]EP0605126 (MOORE BUSINESS FORMS INC) [A] 1,29; | [A]WO9531800 (MEDIA SOLUTIONS INC ;MITCHELL CHAUNCEY T JR (US)) [A] 1,29; | [A]WO9627177 (LEYVAL JEAN PIERRE) [A] 1,29; | [DA]DE29518885U (RITTER JOHANNES A) [DA] 1,29; | [DA]WO9419419 (RITTER JOHANNES A) [DA] 1,29 |