EP0863242 - Program setting- and display arrangement for a program controlled washing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.2003 [2003/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Muggenhoferstrasse 135 90429 Nürnberg / DE | [1998/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wipperfürth, Franz-Josef Egersdorfer Weg 9 90556 Cadolzburg / DE | 02 /
Steinmüller, Harald Brünst 2a 91611 Lehrberg / DE | 03 /
Wick, Oliver Finkenstrasse 35 90559 Burgthann / DE | 04 /
Stamminger, Rainer, Dr. Erbsenbodenstrasse 31 91207 Lauf / DE | [1998/37] | Application number, filing date | 98102163.7 | 07.02.1998 | [1998/37] | Priority number, date | DE1997105877 | 15.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19705877 | [1998/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0863242 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0863242 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | [1999/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0863242 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/00 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
D06F34/32 (EP,US);
D06F2101/10 (EP,US);
D06F2103/02 (EP,US);
D06F2105/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [1999/41] |
Former [1998/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Programmwahl- und Anzeigesystem für programmgesteuerte Waschmaschinen | [1998/37] | English: | Program setting- and display arrangement for a program controlled washing machine | [1998/37] | French: | Dispositif pour la sélection des programmes et l'affichage dans une machine à laver commandée par programme | [1998/37] | Examination procedure | 07.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/36] | 09.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3703767 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE2530580 (MIELE & CIE) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3440038 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 25 - line 34; figure 1; claim 1 * |