blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0877169

EP0877169 - Hydraulic control device for the load-independent control of a double acting actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.10.2004
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.11.2004  [2004/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[1998/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Koetter, Wolfgang
Hohe Anwande 26
71706 Markgroeningen / DE
[1998/46]
Application number, filing date98102270.010.02.1998
[1998/46]
Priority number, dateDE199711922807.05.1997         Original published format: DE 19719228
[1998/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0877169
Date:11.11.1998
Language:DE
[1998/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0877169
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0877169
Date:03.12.2003
Language:DE
[2003/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:F15B11/05
[1998/46]
CPC:
F15B11/163 (EP); F15B13/0417 (EP); F15C3/06 (EP);
F15B2211/30505 (EP); F15B2211/30555 (EP); F15B2211/3111 (EP);
F15B2211/3127 (EP); F15B2211/351 (EP); F15B2211/6054 (EP);
F15B2211/71 (EP); F15B2211/78 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/39]
Former [1998/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Hydraulische Steuereinrichtung zur lastdruckunabhängigen Steuerung eines doppeltwirkenden Motors[1998/46]
English:Hydraulic control device for the load-independent control of a double acting actuator[1998/46]
French:Dispositif de commande hydraulique indépendante de la pression de charge d'un moteur à double effet[1998/46]
Examination procedure19.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
23.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2003Fee for grant paid
02.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE3634728  (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * figure - *;
 [DA]DE4026720  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]DE4136991  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]DE3629850  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0550257  (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 6-23; figures 4,6 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.