EP0857930 - Apparatus and process for drying wet solid particles in fluidized beds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLGAIER WERKE GmbH Ulmer Strasse 75 73066 Uhingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states Allgaier-Werke GmbH Ulmer Strasse 75 73066 Uhingen / DE | ||
Former [1998/33] | For all designated states Allgaier-Werke GmbH & Co. KG Ulmer Strasse 75 73066 Uhingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trojosky, Mathias, Dr. Laubersberg 83 73230 Kirchheim u. Teck / DE | 02 /
Rösner, Otto Schlehenweg 9 73230 Kirchheim u. Teck / DE | [1998/33] | Representative(s) | Haug, Dietmar, et al Andrae Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/33] | Haug, Dietmar, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Andrae Flach Haug Kneissl Bauer Schneider, Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98102291.6 | 10.02.1998 | [1998/33] | Priority number, date | DE1997105175 | 11.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19705175 | [1998/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0857930 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F26B3/08 | [1998/33] | CPC: |
B01J8/36 (EP);
B01J8/26 (EP);
F26B3/08 (EP);
B01J2208/00115 (EP);
B01J2208/0084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/17] |
Former [1998/33] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Trocknen von feuchten Feststoffpartikeln in Wirbelschichten | [1998/33] | English: | Apparatus and process for drying wet solid particles in fluidized beds | [1998/33] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de séchage de particules solides humides dans des lits fluidisés | [1998/33] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/16] | 13.02.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LU, MC | 18.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/10] | 02.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.04.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0199655 (CHARBONNAGES DE FRANCE) [X] 1,2,8,12,13,18,19 * the whole document * [Y] 6,7,9,10,16,17,20; | [Y]FR2213473 (CALIFORNIA PELLET MILL COMPANY) [Y] 6,7,9,16,17 * the whole document *; | [YA]FR2203964 (SPROCKET PROPERTIES LIMITED) [Y] 10,20 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,8,9,12,13; | [A]DE4316320 (DEGUSSA AG) [A] 1-3,8,12,18,19 * the whole document *; | [A]AT380331B (WAAGNER-BIRÓ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [A] 1,2,8,9,12,18,19 * the whole document *; | [A]US2629938 (MONTGOMERY) [A] 1,8,12,18,19 * column W *; | [A]FR2334411 (RICHTER GEDEON VEGYESZETI GYAR R.T.) [A] 1,12 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP0047159 (FLAMELESS FURNACES LIMITED); | [A]WO9414705 (NIRO HOLDING A/S); | [A]FR1128086 (PROST) |