EP0858770 - Device for thermographic analyses of selected organ portions and method for obtaining skin thermographic maps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Belfry Services Limited Abbott Building, Main Street Road Town Tortola / VG | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states Belfry Services Limited Abbott Building, Main Street Road Town, Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barton, Noel Havers Building Road Town, Tortola / VG | [1998/34] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98102425.0 | 12.02.1998 | [1998/34] | Priority number, date | CH19970000353 | 17.02.1997 Original published format: CH 35397 | [1998/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0858770 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0858770 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | [1999/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0858770 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
A61B5/4312 (EP);
A61B5/015 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/34] | Extension states | RO | 26.08.1999 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Durchführung thermographischer Analysen von ausgewählten Teilen von Organen und Verfahren zur Gewinnung thermographischer Bilder der Haut | [1998/34] | English: | Device for thermographic analyses of selected organ portions and method for obtaining skin thermographic maps | [1998/34] | French: | Appareil pour la réalisation d'analyses thermographiques de parties définies d'organes et procédé pour obtenir des cartes thermographiques de la peau | [1998/34] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/43] | 22.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.10.2001 | FI | 10.10.2001 | NL | 10.10.2001 | DK | 10.01.2002 | PT | 10.01.2002 | SE | 10.01.2002 | GR | 11.01.2002 | LU | 12.02.2002 | [2005/01] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 10.10.2001 | |
FI | 10.10.2001 | ||
NL | 10.10.2001 | ||
DK | 10.01.2002 | ||
PT | 10.01.2002 | ||
SE | 10.01.2002 | ||
LU | 12.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 10.10.2001 | |
FI | 10.10.2001 | ||
NL | 10.10.2001 | ||
DK | 10.01.2002 | ||
PT | 10.01.2002 | ||
SE | 10.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 10.10.2001 | |
FI | 10.10.2001 | ||
NL | 10.10.2001 | ||
PT | 10.01.2002 | ||
SE | 10.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 10.10.2001 | |
PT | 10.01.2002 | ||
SE | 10.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 10.10.2001 | |
SE | 10.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 10.01.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3245402 (BOWLING BARNES ROBERT) [A] 1,6,7* column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 28 *; | [A]US4135497 (MEYERS PHILLIP H, et al) [A] 1,6,7 * column 3, line 41 - line 52 * * column 7, line 32 - column 8, line 32; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4246302 (BENTON WILLIAM J, et al) [A] 5 * column 1, line 20 - line 68; figure -; claim - *; | [A]GB2086575 (COLOMBO ALDO) [A] 2,5 * page 1, line 71 - line 104 * * page 2, line 75 - page 3, line 39; figure - *; | [A]US4616912 (JOHNSEN ANDREAS O [DE]) [A] 1,4,6,7 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 45; figures 1,2 * |