EP0860531 - Machine for the cross coupling of webs of carded, not woven fibers, provided with rotary unloading belt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2005 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2006 [2006/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olivo, Vani Via Michela 56 35013 Cittadella / IT | For all designated states Olivo, Paolo Via Michela 56 35013 Cittadella / IT | [1998/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/35] | Representative(s) | Gustorf, Gerhard Bachstrasse 6a 84036 Landshut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | Gustorf, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bachstrasse 6 A 84036 Landshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 98102497.9 | 13.02.1998 | [1998/35] | Priority number, date | IT1997PD00033 | 19.02.1997 Original published format: IT PD970033 | [1998/35] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0860531 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0860531 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/70, D01G25/00 | [2002/42] | CPC: |
D01G25/00 (EP);
D04H1/74 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/35] | D04H1/70 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/35] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Kreuzkopplung von Krempelvliesen mit Rotationsentladeband | [1998/35] | English: | Machine for the cross coupling of webs of carded, not woven fibers, provided with rotary unloading belt | [1998/35] | French: | Machine pour le couplage croisé de nappes non-tissées cardées avec une bande de déchargement rotative | [1998/35] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 11.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09) | 21.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/04] | 25.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0517563 (ASSELIN ETS) [X] 1-5,7 * column 2, line 36 - column 2, line 56 * * column 4, line 26 - column 4, line 32 * * column 8, line 19 - column 8, line 23 * * column 9, line 4 - column 9, line 16; figures 1-4; claims 1-7 *; | [X]EP0517568 (ASSELIN ETS) [X] 1-5,7 * column 2, line 19 - column 2, line 41 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 1 * * column 8, line 31 - column 8, line 43 * * column 8, line 46 - column 8, line 50; figures 1-4; claims 1-6 *; | [X]EP0522893 (ASSELIN ETS) [X] 1-5,7 * column 2, line 33 - column 2, line 56 * * column 3, line 17 - column 3, line 24 * * column 4, line 21 - column 4, line 27 * * column 8, line 15 - column 8, line 19 * * column 8, line 58 - column 9, line 12; figures 1-4; claims 1-7 *; | [X]US5400475 (HILLE EDUARD) [X] 1-5,7 * column 4, line 8 - column 4, line 13 * * column 4, line 62 - column 4, line 65 * * column 6, line 55 - column 6, line 60; figures 1,2; claims 1-14 *; | [X]US1886919 (STURGIS FREDRICK C) [X] 1-5,7 * page 1, line 47 - page 1, line 64 * * page 2, line 111 - page 2, line 123 * * page 4, line 99 - page 5, line 7; figures 3-6; claims 1-13 *; | [X]FR2553102 (ASSELIN ETS) [X] 1-7 * page 7, line 10 - page 7, line 22 * * page 8, line 9 - page 8, line 13 * * page 8, line 28 - page 8, line 32 * * page 9, line 21 - page 10, line 3 * * page 11, line 27 - page 11, line 30 * * page 15, line 1 - page 15, line 6; figure 1; claims 1-15 *; | [X]EP0398240 (DU PONT) [X] 1,7 * column 6, line 11 - column 6, line 33; figures 3,4 *; | [XA]US4830351 (STANISLAW PETER P) [X] 1,7 * figures 2,5,7; claims 1-8 * * column 7, line 23 - column 7, line 58; figure 2 * [A] 8,9; | [X]US3682734 (BURGER WILLIAM H) [X] 1,3-7 * column 3, line 10 - column 3, line 24 * * column 3, line 55 - column 3, line 70; figures 3,4; claims 1-8 *; | [A]US4944502 (PLATZER KURT ET AL) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |