EP0860876 - Arrangement and method for manufacturing CSP-packages for electrical components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATMEL Germany GmbH Theresienstrasse 2 74072 Heilbronn / DE | [2001/37] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 70546 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuisl, Max, Dr. Binsenweiherweg 9 89079 Ulm / DE | 02 /
Strohm, Karl, Dr. Bei der Pilzbuche 40 89075 Ulm / DE | 03 /
Rösler, Manfred, Dr. Käthe-Kollwitz-Weg 106 89081 Ulm / DE | [1998/35] | Application number, filing date | 98102800.4 | 18.02.1998 | [1998/35] | Priority number, date | DE1997106811 | 21.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19706811 | DE1997140055 | 12.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19740055 | [1998/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0860876 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0860876 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/482, H01L21/60 | [1998/35] | CPC: |
H01L24/11 (EP,US);
H01L24/13 (EP);
H01L2224/06135 (EP);
H01L2224/13099 (EP,US);
H01L24/05 (EP);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01024 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01039 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/09701 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/22] |
Former [1998/35] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anordnung und Verfahren zur Herstellung von CSP-Gehäusen für elektrische Bauteile | [1998/35] | English: | Arrangement and method for manufacturing CSP-packages for electrical components | [1998/35] | French: | Arrangement et méthode de fabrication de boîtiers semiconducteurs à largeur de puce pour composants électriques | [1998/35] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 01.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/38] | 16.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9603772 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-19 * figures 1-6,9-11 * * page 7, line 5 - page 9, line 11 * * page 9, line 22 - page 11, line 12 * * page 12, line 3 - line 6 *; | [XA]US5557149 (RICHARDS JOHN G [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-13,16 * figures 1,87-106 * * column 29, line 29 - line 54 * * column 30, line 12 - line 25 * * column 30, line 44 - line 55 * * column 31, line 13 - line 18 * * column 32, line 26 - line 54 * * column 33, line 4 - line 15 * * column 33, line 28 - line 42 * * column 33, line 66 - column 34, line 26 * * column 34, line 40 - column 35, line 8 * * column 35, line 52 - line 67 * [A] 14,15,19; | [DXA]US5441898 (RICHARDS JOHN G [US], et al) [DX] 1-8,11,12 * figures 5,6,8-30 * * column 11, line 52 - column 13, line 60 * * column 16, line 43 - line 65 * [A] 10,13-16,19; | [A]EP0734059 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO [JP]) [A] 9,17-19 * figures 1-8 * * column 4, line 12 - line 45 * * column 11, line 38 - line 45 *; | [A]JPH08306745 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 097, no. 003, & JP08306745 A 19961122 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [A] 9,17-19 * abstract * |