EP0860191 - Plastic cover for filter casing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.05.2001 [2001/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAHLE Filtersysteme GmbH Pragstrasse 54 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/03] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states KNECHT FILTERWERKE GMBH Pragstrasse 54 70376 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fritz, Jochen Zeisigweg 4 73655 Plüderhausen / DE | 02 /
Müller, Hubert Nägelesäcker 53 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [1998/35] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | Patentanwalts-Partnerschaft Rotermund + Pfusch Waiblinger Strasse 11 70372 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98102867.3 | 19.02.1998 | [1998/35] | Priority number, date | DE1997106644 | 20.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19706644 | [1998/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0860191 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0860191 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0860191 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/30 | [1998/35] | CPC: |
B01D35/30 (EP);
B01D2201/301 (EP);
B01D2201/304 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1999/50] |
Former [1998/35] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kunststoff-Deckel für ein Filtergehäuse | [1998/35] | English: | Plastic cover for filter casing | [1998/35] | French: | Couvercle en matière plastique pour boîtier filtrant | [1998/35] | Examination procedure | 20.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/20] | 24.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]GB2307422 (KNECHT FILTERWERKE GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0330569 (LABINAL [FR]) [Y] 1-4,11 * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0512639 (FAIREY ARLON BV [NL]) [Y] 1-4,11 * column 2, line 12 - line 15; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0638348 (LABINAL [FR]) [A] 1 * column 8, line 40 - line 44; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US4693820 (BAXTER RAYMOND D [US]) [A] 1 * figure 9 *; | [A]FR1532437 (PREC MECANIQUE LABINAL) [A] 1 * figure 3 * |