09.04.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] |
12.03.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] |
28.11.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] |
21.11.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] |
21.03.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] |
04.03.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.01.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.12.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.08.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.07.2002 |
Change - French title |
published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] |
21.05.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.03.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.01.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.12.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.08.2001 |
First examination report |
|
16.08.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.12.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.09.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
05.09.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
05.09.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.07.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 23.08.2000 [2000/34] |
12.05.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] |
30.03.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
29.10.1999 |
Publication of search report |
published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] |
07.08.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.09.1998 [1998/39] |