EP0863182 - Tire tread of coupled SIBR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | ||
Former [1998/37] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zanzig, David John 3556 Avanti Lane Uniontown, Ohio 44685 / US | 02 /
Hsu, Wen-Liang 2034 Bent Creek Trail Cuyahoga Falls, Ohio 44223 / US | 03 /
Halasa, Adel Farhan 5040 Everett Road Bath, Ohio 44333 / US | 04 /
Matrana, Barry Allen 1639 Liberty Drive Akron, Ohio 44313 / US | [1998/37] | Representative(s) | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | ||
Former [1998/37] | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg Patent-Department L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 98103355.8 | 26.02.1998 | [1998/37] | Priority number, date | US19970811629 | 05.03.1997 Original published format: US 811629 | [1998/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0863182 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0863182 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08L9/00, B60C1/00, // (C08L9/00, 9:06) | [1998/37] | CPC: |
C08F236/10 (EP,US);
B60C1/0016 (EP,US);
C08L9/00 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08L7/00 (EP,US);
C08L9/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L9/00, C08L2666/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/21] |
Former [1998/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Reifenlauffläche welche gekuppeltes SIBR enthält | [1998/37] | English: | Tire tread of coupled SIBR | [1998/37] | French: | Bande de roulement pour pneumatiques contenant du SIBR couplé | [1998/37] | Examination procedure | 15.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/15] | 18.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5272220 (RODGERS MICHAEL B [US], et al) [DA] 1* column 9, line 45 - line 50; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0645423 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * |