EP0863294 - Method and device for the industrial construction of reinforced ceiling structures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ED. ZÜBLIN AG Albstadtweg 3 D-70567 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states Bilfinger + Berger Bauaktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 05 62 68005 Mannheim / DE | For all designated states Murer Engineering Giselihalde 9 6006 Luzern / CH | [1998/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zwick, Otto Netztal 16 69469 Weinheim / DE | 02 /
Murer, Roland Oberseeburg 14 6006 Luzern / CH | 03 /
Schömig, Edgar Mühlrain 15 70180 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
Hering, Steffen Olivenstrasse 1 70619 Stuttgart / DE | 05 /
Walliser, Thomas Magdeburger Strasse 42 72108 Rottenburg / DE | [1998/37] | Application number, filing date | 98103420.0 | 27.02.1998 | [1998/37] | Priority number, date | DE1997109336 | 07.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19709336 | [1998/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0863294 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0863294 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E21D11/10 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
E21D11/102 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/21] |
Former [1998/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für das industrielle Erstellen bewehrter Deckenkonstruktionen | [1998/37] | English: | Method and device for the industrial construction of reinforced ceiling structures | [1998/37] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la construction industrielle des structures de plafond renforcés | [1998/37] | Examination procedure | 18.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/37] | 20.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 08.06.2005 | GB | 08.06.2005 | IT | 08.06.2005 | NL | 08.06.2005 | DK | 08.09.2005 | SE | 08.09.2005 | CH | 28.02.2006 | LI | 28.02.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/12] | GB | 08.06.2005 | |
IT | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2006 | ||
LI | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | GB | 08.06.2005 | |
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2006 | ||
LI | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | GB | 08.06.2005 | |
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | GB | 08.06.2005 | |
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | GB | 08.06.2005 | |
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 08.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63229385 ; | [A]DE1064710 (JOSEF BOESSNER); | [A]US4407609 (CERUTTI HENRY P [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]GB2262128 (GILLESPIE JOHN) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2691204 (AL CANT COFFRAGES [FR]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE19509315 (BREUCHA HERMANN ING GRAD [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890125), vol. 013, no. 032, Database accession no. (P - 817), & JP63229385 A 19880926 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |