EP0861959 - Security lock with access control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Talleres De Escoriaza, S.A. (TESA) Barrio Ventas, s/n 20300 Irun (Guipuzcoa) / ES | [1998/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aramburu, Luis Angel Ruano Paseo Zorroaga, 7 - 4D San Sebastiona, Guipuzcoa / ES | [1998/36] | Representative(s) | Feldkamp, Rainer, et al Garmischer Strasse 4 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | Feldkamp, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing., et al Garmischer Strasse 4 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98103524.9 | 27.02.1998 | [1998/36] | Priority number, date | ES19970000430 | 27.02.1997 Original published format: ES 9700430 | [1998/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0861959 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0861959 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | [2000/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0861959 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E05B47/06, E05B49/00, E05B13/00 | [1998/36] | CPC: |
G07C9/00722 (EP,US);
E05B47/0692 (EP,US);
E05B2047/0031 (EP,US);
E05B2047/0086 (EP,US);
E05B65/1086 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5226 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5805 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7062 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7068 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7107 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [2001/06] |
Former [1998/36] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sicherheitsschloss mit Zugangskontrolle | [1998/36] | English: | Security lock with access control | [1998/36] | French: | Serrure de sécurité avec contrôle d'accès | [1998/36] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4429556 (KAMBIC RAYMOND V [US]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 20 - line 44 * * column 8, line 58 - column 9, line 27 * * column 10, line 7 - line 36; figure . *; | [A]GB2262770 (TALLERES ESCORIAZA SA [ES]) [A] 1 * page 11, line 6 - page 13, line 17; figures 26-34 *; | [A]US5475996 (CHEN TSUN-HSING [TW]) [A] 1* column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 46; figure . * |