EP0863199 - Acidic pH detergent composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meine, Georg, Dr. Hofstadt 4 40822 Mettmann / DE | [1998/37] | Application number, filing date | 98103669.2 | 03.03.1998 | [1998/37] | Priority number, date | DE1997108500 | 03.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19708500 | [1998/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0863199 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0863199 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/10, C11D3/20, C11D17/06, // C11D1/72, C11D1/66, C11D1/52, C11D1/62 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
C11D3/2086 (EP);
C11D17/06 (EP);
C11D3/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/21] |
Former [1998/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Waschmittel mit saurem pH-Wert | [1998/37] | English: | Acidic pH detergent composition | [1998/37] | French: | Composition détergente ayant un pH acide | [1998/37] | Examination procedure | 03.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/37] | 26.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/41] | 09.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0456315 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *; | [D]WO9117232 ; | [Y]JPS6424900 ; | [Y]EP0530635 (BENCKISER GMBH JOH A) [Y] 1-10 * page 3, line 1 - line 10 *; | [A]US5431841 (LOCKHART RONALD R) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 5, paragraph 3 *; | [A]EP0110588 (UNILEVER PLC ;UNILEVER NV (NL)) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0606712 (CLOROX CO) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890515), vol. 013, no. 205, Database accession no. (C - 595), & JP01024900 A 19890126 (SANKI SHOKUHIN KK;OTHERS: 01) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * |