EP0865893 - Method and apparatus for producing pipes with foam insulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1998/39] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmiade, Werner Alte Dorfstrasse 44 49459 Lembruch / DE | [1998/39] | Application number, filing date | 98103999.3 | 06.03.1998 | [1998/39] | Priority number, date | DE1997111068 | 17.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19711068 | [1998/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0865893 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0865893 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | [1999/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0865893 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/38 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
B29C44/386 (EP,US);
F16L59/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/36] |
Former [1998/39] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtungen zur Herstellung von mit Schaumstoffen gedämmten Rohren | [1998/39] | English: | Method and apparatus for producing pipes with foam insulation | [1998/39] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour fabriquer un tuyau d'une enveloppe isolante en mousse | [1998/39] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 15.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 25.09.2002 | FR | 25.09.2002 | GB | 25.09.2002 | IT | 25.09.2002 | NL | 25.09.2002 | SE | 25.12.2002 | AT | 06.03.2003 | BE | 31.03.2003 | CH | 31.03.2003 | LI | 31.03.2003 | [2008/12] |
Former [2006/14] | FI | 25.09.2002 | |
FR | 25.09.2002 | ||
GB | 25.09.2002 | ||
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
AT | 06.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2005/21] | FI | 25.09.2002 | |
GB | 25.09.2002 | ||
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
AT | 06.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | GB | 25.09.2002 | |
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
AT | 06.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | GB | 25.09.2002 | |
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 25.09.2002 | |
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/21] | GB | 25.09.2002 | |
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 25.09.2002 | |
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | SE | 25.12.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3439075 (BAUER RICHARD H, et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document * * column 6, paragraph L - column 7, line 35; figure 13 *; | [A]DE2257661 (BAYER AG); | [A]US4522578 (MARTIN JR WILLIAM W [US], et al) |