EP0864767 - Junction sleeve and device for fastening articles to walls or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWI Heinrich Wilke GmbH Prof.-Bier-Strasse 1-5 34454 Bad Arolsen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states HEWI HEINRICH WILKE GMBH Prof.-Bier-Strasse 1-5 34454 Bad Arolsen / DE | ||
Former [1998/38] | For all designated states HEWI HEINRICH WILKE GMBH Professor Bierstrasse 1-5 34454 Arolsen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dziuk, Richard Vosskamp 1 D-34454 Bad Arolsen / DE | [1998/38] | Representative(s) | Freiherr von Schorlemer, Reinfried Karthäuser Strasse 5A 34117 Kassel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | Freiherr von Schorlemer, Reinfried, Dipl.-Phys. Karthäuser Strasse 5A 34117 Kassel / DE | Application number, filing date | 98104116.3 | 07.03.1998 | [1998/38] | Priority number, date | DE19972004342U | 11.03.1997 Original published format: DE 29704342 U | [1998/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0864767 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0864767 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | [1999/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0864767 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16B37/12, E05B1/00 | [1998/38] | CPC: |
F16B25/0052 (EP);
F16B13/002 (EP);
F16B25/0031 (EP);
F16B25/0047 (EP);
F16B37/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/18] |
Former [1998/38] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbindungsmuffe und Vorrichtung zur Befestigung von Gegenständen an Wänden oder dgl. | [1998/38] | English: | Junction sleeve and device for fastening articles to walls or the like | [1998/38] | French: | Manchon de raccord et dispositif pour la fixation d'objets à des murs ou similaires | [1998/38] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 22.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.07.2003
07.04.2004
WITHDRAWN Kerb-Konus-Vertriebs-GmbH Wernher-von-Braun-Strasse 7 92224 Amberg / DE Opponent's representative Gehrsitz, Stefan, et al, et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstrasse 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.07.2003
07.04.2004
WITHDRAWN Kerb-Konus-Vertriebs-GmbH Wernher-von-Braun-Strasse 7 92224 Amberg / DE Opponent's representative Gehrsitz, Stefan, Dr., et al, et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 86063 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2003/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.07.2003
WITHDRAWN Kerb-Konus-Vertriebs-GmbH Wernher-von-Braun-Strasse 7 92224 Amberg / DE Opponent's representative Gehrsitz, Stefan, Dr. Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 86063 Augsburg / DE | 04.08.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.02.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 06.05.2004 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2004/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 09.10.2002 | GB | 09.10.2002 | IT | 09.10.2002 | NL | 09.10.2002 | DK | 09.01.2003 | SE | 09.01.2003 | AT | 07.03.2003 | BE | 31.03.2003 | CH | 31.03.2003 | LI | 31.03.2003 | ES | 29.04.2003 | [2008/12] |
Former [2007/17] | FR | 09.10.2002 | |
GB | 09.10.2002 | ||
NL | 09.10.2002 | ||
DK | 09.01.2003 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
AT | 07.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FR | 09.10.2002 | |
GB | 09.10.2002 | ||
NL | 09.10.2002 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
AT | 07.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | GB | 09.10.2002 | |
NL | 09.10.2002 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
AT | 07.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
FR | 01.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | GB | 09.10.2002 | |
NL | 09.10.2002 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
FR | 01.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 09.10.2002 | |
NL | 09.10.2002 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
FR | 01.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/21] | GB | 09.10.2002 | |
NL | 09.10.2002 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
FR | 01.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | NL | 09.10.2002 | |
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
FR | 01.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | NL | 09.10.2002 | |
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 09.10.2002 | |
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 09.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2823574 (JOSEPH ROSAN) [Y] 1-9 * figure 4 *; | [Y]US4003287 (ZIAYLEK JR THEODORE) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [XY]GB1482624 (BARNSDALE A) [X] 1-5,7 * the whole document * [Y] 6,8,9; | [XY]DE9017935U (FA. INPRA ING.) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 2; figures 1,2,5-7; claim 1 * [Y] 3,6,9; | [A]DE29620246U (WAGNER GB LTD [GB])[A] 10-13 | by applicant | DE9314641U | DE29605742U |