EP0864927 - Water-developable photosensitive resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.2001 [2001/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JSR Corporation 11-24, Tsukiji 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [1998/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koshimura, Katsuo c/o JRS Corporation, 11-24, Tsukiji-2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Tadaaki c/o JRS Corporation, 11-24, Tsukiji-2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Shimada, Noboru c/o JRS Corporation, 11-24, Tsukiji-2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Yasuda, Kenji c/o JRS Corporation, 11-24, Tsukiji-2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/38] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/38] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98104278.1 | 10.03.1998 | [1998/38] | Priority number, date | JP19970072830 | 11.03.1997 Original published format: JP 7283097 | JP19970076717 | 13.03.1997 Original published format: JP 7671797 | [1998/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0864927 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0864927 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/033 | [1998/38] | CPC: |
G03F7/033 (EP,US);
Y10S430/107 (EP,US);
Y10S430/108 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/21] |
Former [1998/38] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mit Wasser entwickelbare lichtempfindliche Harzzusammensetzung | [1998/38] | English: | Water-developable photosensitive resin composition | [1998/38] | French: | Composition de résine photosensible développable à l'eau | [1998/38] | Examination procedure | 08.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 20.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07114184 ; | [A]JPH08320561 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 095, no. 008, & JP07114184 A 19950502 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 07, Database accession no. 97-074091, XP002069705 & JPH08320561 A 00000000 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |