Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.09.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] |
04.08.2000 | Publication of search report | published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] |
07.04.2000 | Renewal fee | |
27.08.1999 | Change - applicant | published on 13.10.1999 [1999/41] |
11.09.1998 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.10.1998 [1998/44] |