Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH10295802 | Global Dossier | 10.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19716606 | 21.04.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0873756 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2000 | A3 | EP0873756 | 28.10.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19716606 | 21.04.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2235090 | 21.10.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19716606 | 21.04.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19716606 | 22.10.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19716606 | 21.04.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO981079L | 22.10.1998 | L | NO981079D0 | 11.03.1998 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DE19716606 | 21.04.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6022553 | 08.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19716606 | 21.04.1997 |