Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0863060 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2008 | B1 | EP0863060 | 16.09.1998 | A3 | EP0863060 | 09.09.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP93116639 | 14.10.1993 | US96345092 | 19.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5366237 | 22.11.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US23013694 | 20.04.1994 | US96345092 | 19.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0600198 | Global Dossier | 23.09.1998 | B1 | EP0600198 | 17.08.1994 | A3 | EP0600198 | 08.06.1994 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US96345092 | 19.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU666572B | Global Dossier | 15.02.1996 | B2 | AU4614293 | 05.05.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US96345092 | 19.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE171422T | 15.10.1998 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US96345092 | 19.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE390331T | 15.04.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US96345092 | 19.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9304278 | 26.04.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US96345092 | 19.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2108724 | 20.05.1997 | C | CA2108724 | 20.04.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96345092 | 19.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69321199T | 27.05.1999 | T2 | DE69321199D1 | 29.10.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US96345092 | 19.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69334210T | 09.04.2009 | T2 | DE69334210D1 | 08.05.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US96345092 | 19.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0600198T | 14.06.1999 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US96345092 | 19.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2121909T | 16.12.1998 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US96345092 | 19.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR970000623B | 16.01.1997 | B1 | KR940008929 | 16.05.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US96345092 | 19.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9306307 | 31.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US96345092 | 19.10.1992 | Type | Earlier application | EP0600198 |