EP0863060 - Axle suspension systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOLER COMPANY. 500 Park Boulevard, Suite 1010 Itasca, Illinois 60143-1285 / US | [2008/13] |
Former [1998/37] | For all designated states THE BOLER COMPANY. 500 Park Boulevard, Suite 1010 Itasca, Illinois 60143-1285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dilling, Scott 6391 Harborview Avenue N.W., Canton, Ohio 44718 / US | 02 /
Keeler, Michael J. 5671 Foxchase Avenue N.W., Canton, Ohio 44718 / US | 03 /
Ramsey, John 824 Bellarbor N.W., Canton, Ohio 44708 / US | 04 /
Ross, Joseph M. 1685 Ashley Avenue N.E., North Canton, Ohio 44720 / US | [2008/12] |
Former [1998/37] | 01 /
Dilling, Scott 6391 Harborview Avenue N.W., Canton, Ohio 44718 / US | ||
02 /
Keller, Michael J. 5671 Foxchase Avenue N.W., Canton, Ohio 44718 / US | |||
03 /
Ramsey, John 824 Bellarbor N.W., Canton, Ohio 44708 / US | |||
04 /
Ross, Joseph M. 1685 Ashley Avenue N.E., North Canton, Ohio 44720 / US | Representative(s) | Prato, Roberto, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | Prato, Roberto, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 98104823.4 | 14.10.1993 | [1998/37] | Priority number, date | US19920963450 | 19.10.1992 Original published format: US 963450 | [1998/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0863060 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0863060 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | [1998/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0863060 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60T1/06, B60G21/055, B60G9/00, B60G7/00 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
B60G9/003 (EP,KR,US);
B60G11/27 (EP,KR,US);
B60G21/051 (EP,KR,US);
B60G7/001 (EP,KR,US);
B60G7/02 (EP,KR,US);
B60G2200/21 (EP,KR,US);
B60G2200/31 (EP,US);
B60G2202/135 (EP,KR,US);
B60G2202/142 (EP,US);
B60G2202/1424 (EP,KR,US);
B60G2202/152 (EP,KR,US);
B60G2204/128 (EP,KR,US);
B60G2204/129 (EP,KR,US);
B60G2204/14 (EP,US);
B60G2204/143 (EP,KR,US);
B60G2204/41 (EP,US);
B60G2204/4104 (EP,KR,US);
B60G2204/4306 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/37] | Title | German: | Achsaufhängungssystem | [1998/37] | English: | Axle suspension systems | [1998/37] | French: | Système de suspension d'essieu | [1998/37] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 05.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93116639.1 / EP0600198 | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.03.2008 | DK | 26.03.2008 | IT | 26.03.2008 | SE | 26.06.2008 | GR | 27.06.2008 | ES | 07.07.2008 | PT | 01.09.2008 | IE | 14.10.2008 | LU | 14.10.2008 | CH | 31.10.2008 | LI | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/28] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
IT | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
IE | 14.10.2008 | ||
LU | 14.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
IT | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
IE | 14.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 26.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6346913 ; | [A]FR1084119 (CAZENAVE ETS) [A] 1 * page 1, column L, line 14 - line 31; figure - * * page 1, column R, line 18 - page 2, column L, line 6 *; | [A]US3819242 (ROBINSON J) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4015698 (SOUSAMIAN WILLIAM, et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,4 *; | [A]US4114923 (RAIDEL JOHN E) [A] 1 * column 2, line 31 - line 32; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US4166640 (VAN DENBERG ERVIN K [US]) [DA] 1,6-14 * figures 5-7 *; | [A]DE3119022 (PIEDERSTORFER SEN JOSEF) [A] 1 * page 11, line 3 - page 12, line 2; figures 3,4 * * page 12, line 29 - page 13, line 5 *; | [A]US4427213 (RAIDEL JR JOHN E [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2545422 (MATRA AUTOMOBILE [FR]) [A] 1,2* page 3, line 25 - line 32; figures 1-3 *; | [DA]US5037126 (GOTTSCHALK MICHAEL J [US], et al) [DA] 1,6-14 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0458665 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 11 - line 43; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880722), vol. 12, no. 262, Database accession no. (M - 721)<3109>, & JP63046913 A 19880227 (MASANOBU NAKAMURA) [A] 3 * abstract * | by applicant | US3140880 | US3332701 | US3482854 | US3547215 | US3612572 | US3751066 | US3785673 | US3918738 | US4166640 | US5037126 |