EP0869062 - Turbine mount, in particular for propeller aircraft, with a framework for fixing a turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Südstrasse 125 53175 Bonn / DE | For all designated states ERAS GmbH Hannah-Vogt-Strasse 1 37085 Göttingen / DE | [1999/12] |
Former [1998/41] | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Südstrasse 125 53175 Bonn / DE | ||
For all designated states ERAS GmbH Hannah-Vogt-Strasse 1 37085 Göttingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Breitbach, Elmar J., Prof. Dr.-Ing. Bonhoefferweg 6 37075 Göttingen / DE | 02 /
Grützmacher, Torsten Elisabeth-Heimpel-Weg 17 37085 Göttingen / DE | [1998/41] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 31 62 37021 Göttingen / DE | ||
Former [1998/41] | Patentanwälte Rehberg + Hüppe Am Kirschberge 22 37085 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98104863.0 | 18.03.1998 | [1998/41] | Priority number, date | DE1997113365 | 01.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19713365 | [1998/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0869062 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0869062 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | [1999/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0869062 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B64D27/26 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
B64D27/12 (EP,US);
B64D27/18 (EP,US);
Y02T50/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/41] | B64D27/26, B64D29/02 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [1999/37] |
Former [1998/41] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Triebwerksaufhängung, insbesondere für Propellerflugzeuge, mit einem Stabwerk zur Befestigung eines Triebwerks | [1998/41] | English: | Turbine mount, in particular for propeller aircraft, with a framework for fixing a turbine | [1998/41] | French: | Support de turbine, en particulier pour aéronefs à hélice, avec une ossature pour la fixation de la turbine | [1998/41] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/11] | 26.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2309402 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * page 3, line 18 - line 37 * * page 6, line 35 - page 7, line 39 * * page 9, line 16 - line 31 * * figures 2-4 *; | [Y]NL47605C (M.F.A. JULIEN) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, line 1 - line 19 * * page 2, line 10 - line 23 * * figures 8,9 *; | [Y]DE4008568 (TOPEXPRESS LTD [GB]) [Y] 7 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 64 * * claims 8,9 * * figure - *; | [YD]DE4310825 (DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [YD] 9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2698848 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 14 - page 6, line 2 * * figures 2,3 * | by applicant | DE4310825 | DE19527514 |