EP0872420 - Lubrification process and sealing arrangement for a packaging machine with folding turret [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co.) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Focke, Heinz Moorstrasse 64 27283 Verden / DE | 02 /
Häfker, Thomas Paschkebergstrasse 24 27299 Langwedel-Etelsen / DE | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | Bolte, Erich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98104966.1 | 19.03.1998 | [1998/43] | Priority number, date | DE1997115653 | 15.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19715653 | [1998/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0872420 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0872420 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65B19/24, F16J15/40 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
B65B19/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/26] |
Former [1998/43] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schmierungsverfahren und Dichtungsvorrichtung für Verpackungsmaschine mit Faltrevolver | [1998/43] | English: | Lubrification process and sealing arrangement for a packaging machine with folding turret | [1998/43] | French: | Procédé de lubrification et arrangement d'étanchéité pour machine d'emballage présentant un révolver de pliage | [1998/43] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/20] | 22.04.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 29.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.05.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2042406 (USM CORP) [A] 1,2,5-7 * figures 4,6,9A,13,13A *; | [A]US4305592 (PETERSON HAAKON O) [A] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4971306 (JINNOUCHI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,6 * column 3, line 37 - line 45; figures 16,17 *; | [A]DE4119768 (KAYSER ALBRECHT DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 1,2,5-7 * figure 2 *; | [Y]EP0727354 (SASIB SPA [IT]) [Y] 1,2,5,6 * column 3, line 27 - line 47; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19605354 (GD SPA [IT]) [A] 1,5 * figure 2 *; | [A]WO9713084 (RAMSAY THOMAS W [CA]) [A] 1,2,5-7* figure 45 * |