26.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
06.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
20.02.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] |
19.01.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] |
12.12.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] |
21.11.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] |
03.10.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] |
26.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] |
05.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] |
22.08.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] |
20.06.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] |
27.12.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] |
30.11.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.07.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.04.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.07.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.04.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.03.2001 |
First examination report |
|
22.03.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.04.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.02.2000 |
Change - applicant |
published on 29.03.2000 [2000/13] |
24.06.1999 |
Change - extension states |
|
23.04.1999 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 09.06.1999 [1999/23] |
08.01.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] |
14.08.1998 |
Publication of search report |
published on 30.09.1998 [1998/40] |
07.08.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.09.1998 [1998/39] |