Designated contracting states | AT | Lapse: 05.02.2003 | BE | Lapse: 05.02.2003 | CH | | DE | | DK | Lapse: 05.05.2003 | ES | | FI | Lapse: 05.02.2003 | FR | | GB | | GR | Lapse: 05.02.2003 | IE | Lapse: 19.03.2003 | IT | | LI | | LU | Lapse: 19.03.2003 | MC | Lapse: 31.03.2003 | NL | | PT | Lapse: 05.05.2003 | SE | Lapse: 05.05.2003 | Examination procedure | 21.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | European patent granted | 05.02.2003 | Opposition procedure | 06.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.01.2004 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 05.02.2003 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Event date: | 14.02.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 13.03.2003 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 69811134 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20030313 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 05.02.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 23.09.1998 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Event date: | 23.09.1998 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI | | Event date: | 30.09.1998 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A3 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Event date: | 30.09.1998 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI | | Event date: | 24.02.1999 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19981217 | | Event date: | 09.06.1999 | | Event description: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Free Format Text: | AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Event date: | 29.03.2000 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. | | Event date: | 29.03.2000 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | GLEGG WATER CONDITIONING, INC. | | Event date: | 09.05.2001 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20010327 | | Event date: | 05.03.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 11.07.2003 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Event date: | 29.08.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PUEA | Code Expl.: | ASSIGNMENT OF THE SHARE | OWNER: | GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY | Free Format Text: | GLEGG WATER CONDITIONING, INC.#29 ROYAL ROAD#GUELPH, ONTARIO N1H 1G2 (CA) $ ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD.#12-1, YURAKUCHO 1-CHOME, CHIYODA-KU#TOKYO 100-8405 (JP) -TRANSFER TO- GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY#3135 EASTON TURNPIKE#FAIRFIELD/CT 06431 (US) $ ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD.#12-1, YURAKUCHO 1-CHOME, CHIYODA-KU#TOKYO 100-8405 (JP) | | Event date: | 01.10.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2192284 T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | | Event date: | 03.11.2003 | | Event description: | NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS | OWNER: | ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. | | Event date: | 03.11.2003 | | Event description: | NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS | OWNER: | GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY | | Event date: | 03.11.2003 | | Event description: | NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1 | OWNER: | ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. | | Event date: | 03.11.2003 | | Event description: | NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1 | OWNER: | GE WATER INC. | | Event date: | 14.01.2004 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE MM4A | Code Expl.: | -PATENT LAPSED | | Event date: | 28.01.2004 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20031106 | | Event date: | 28.01.2004 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | | Event date: | 20.02.2004 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR TQ | Code Expl.: | PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY | | Event date: | 01.03.2004 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES PC2A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSFER OF PATENT | | Event date: | 02.01.2008 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20070524 | Year of Fee Payment: | 10 | | Event date: | 05.02.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030205 | | Event date: | 05.02.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030205 | | Event date: | 05.05.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030505 | | Event date: | 05.02.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030205 | | Event date: | 05.02.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030205 | | Event date: | 19.03.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20030319 | | Event date: | 19.03.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20030319 | | Event date: | 31.03.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20030331 | | Event date: | 05.05.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030505 | | Event date: | 05.05.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030505 | | Event date: | 14.03.2007 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20070314 | Year of Fee Payment: | 10 | | Event date: | 04.03.2007 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20070304 | Year of Fee Payment: | 10 | | Event date: | 15.03.2007 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20070315 | Year of Fee Payment: | 10 | | Event date: | 17.04.2007 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20070417 | Year of Fee Payment: | 10 | | Event date: | 14.03.2007 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20070314 | Year of Fee Payment: | 10 | | Event date: | 30.04.2008 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20070308 | Year of Fee Payment: | 10 | | Event date: | 25.06.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PFA | Code Expl.: | NAME/FIRM CHANGED | OWNER: | GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY | Free Format Text: | GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY#3135 EASTON TURNPIKE#FAIRFIELD/CT 06431 (US) $ ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD.#12-1, YURAKUCHO 1-CHOME, CHIYODA-KU#TOKYO 100-8405 (JP) -TRANSFER TO- GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY#3135 EASTON TURNPIKE#FAIRFIELD/CT 06431 (US) $ ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD.#12-1, YURAKUCHO 1-CHOME, CHIYODA-KU#TOKYO 100-8405 (JP) | | Event date: | 26.11.2008 | | Event description: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20080319 | | Event date: | 28.11.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20081001 | | Event date: | 01.12.2008 | | Event description: | NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20081001 | | Event date: | 19.12.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20081125 | | Event date: | 30.01.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080331 | | Event date: | 30.01.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20081001 | | Event date: | 30.01.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080331 | | Event date: | 30.04.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080331 | | Event date: | 30.06.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080319 | | Event date: | 31.07.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080322 | | Event date: | 31.08.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080319 | | Event date: | 31.10.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 28.05.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20080322 | | Event date: | 27.12.2002 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 30.11.2002 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 31.07.2002 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 14.08.1998 | | Event description: | SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013 | | Event date: | 07.08.1998 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 12.12.2003 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 12.12.2003 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Event date: | 28.06.2023 | | Event description: | OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED | Effective DATE: | 20230521 | |