EP0865816 - Apparatus for producing deionized water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | For all designated states Glegg Water Conditioning, Inc. 29 Royal Road Guelph, Ontario N1H 1G2 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | ||
For all designated states Glegg Water Conditioning, Inc. 29 Royal Road Guelph, Ontario N1H 1G2 / CA | |||
Former [1998/39] | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company Ltd. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | ||
For all designated states Glegg Water Conditioning, Inc. 29 Royal Road Guelph, Ontario N1H 1G2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terada, Ichiro, Asahi Glass Company Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho, 1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Komatsu, Ken, Asahi Glass Company Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho, 1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Umemura, Kazuo, Asahi Glass Company Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho, 1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Iwamoto, Junjiro, Asahi Glass Company Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho, 1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Huehnergard, Mark Philip Glegg Water Conditioning Inc., 29 Royal Road Guelph, Ontario, N1H 1G2 / CA | [1998/39] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/39] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98105051.1 | 19.03.1998 | [1998/39] | Priority number, date | JP19970066762 | 19.03.1997 Original published format: JP 6676297 | [1998/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0865816 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0865816 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | [1998/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0865816 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/48, C02F1/469, B01J47/08 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
B01D61/48 (EP,US);
B01J47/08 (EP,US);
C02F1/4604 (EP,US);
C02F1/469 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/39] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von vollentsalztem Wasser | [1998/39] | English: | Apparatus for producing deionized water | [1998/39] | French: | Appareil de production d'eau déminéralisée | [1998/39] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/08] | 27.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.02.2003 | BE | 05.02.2003 | FI | 05.02.2003 | GR | 05.02.2003 | IE | 19.03.2003 | LU | 19.03.2003 | MC | 31.03.2003 | DK | 05.05.2003 | PT | 05.05.2003 | SE | 05.05.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 05.02.2003 | |
BE | 05.02.2003 | ||
FI | 05.02.2003 | ||
GR | 05.02.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
LU | 19.03.2003 | ||
DK | 05.05.2003 | ||
PT | 05.05.2003 | ||
SE | 05.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | AT | 05.02.2003 | |
BE | 05.02.2003 | ||
FI | 05.02.2003 | ||
GR | 05.02.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
DK | 05.05.2003 | ||
PT | 05.05.2003 | ||
SE | 05.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 05.02.2003 | |
BE | 05.02.2003 | ||
FI | 05.02.2003 | ||
GR | 05.02.2003 | ||
DK | 05.05.2003 | ||
PT | 05.05.2003 | ||
SE | 05.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 05.02.2003 | |
FI | 05.02.2003 | ||
GR | 05.02.2003 | ||
DK | 05.05.2003 | ||
PT | 05.05.2003 | ||
SE | 05.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 05.02.2003 | |
FI | 05.02.2003 | ||
GR | 05.02.2003 | ||
PT | 05.05.2003 | ||
SE | 05.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 05.02.2003 | |
GR | 05.02.2003 | ||
PT | 05.05.2003 | ||
SE | 05.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 05.02.2003 | |
PT | 05.05.2003 | ||
SE | 05.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 05.02.2003 | |
SE | 05.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/32] | SE | 05.05.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05277344 ; | [A]EP0422453 (MILLIPORE CORP [US]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - line 10 ** page 3, line 39 - page 4, line 7 *; | [A]EP0680932 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK [GB]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 35 * * column 4, line 37 - line 43 * * column 15, line 1 - line 32 *; | [A]WO9622162 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,3-6 * abstract * * page 7, line 4 - line 18 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940202), vol. 018, no. 061, Database accession no. (C - 1160), & JP05277344 A 19931026 (NOMURA MICRO SCI KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 47, Database accession no. 93-373712, XP002073592 [ ] * abstract * |