EP0877430 - Ink-jet recording head with piezoelectric device and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1998/46] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Qiu, Hong c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 02 /
Moriya, Sohichi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 03 /
Kamei, Hiroyuki c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 04 /
Sumi, Koji c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | [1998/46] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98105341.6 | 24.03.1998 | [1998/46] | Priority number, date | JP19970072212 | 25.03.1997 Original published format: JP 7221297 | JP19970232638 | 28.08.1997 Original published format: JP 23263897 | JP19980047484 | 27.02.1998 Original published format: JP 4748498 | [1998/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0877430 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0877430 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0877430 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/09, B41J2/14 | [1998/46] | CPC: |
B41J2/1628 (EP,US);
B41J2/14233 (EP,US);
B41J2/161 (EP,US);
B41J2/1645 (EP,US);
B41J2/1646 (EP,US);
H10N30/2047 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/33] |
Former [1998/46] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungskopf mit piezoelektrischer Anordnung und Herstellungsverfahren | [1998/46] | English: | Ink-jet recording head with piezoelectric device and method for manufacturing the same | [1998/46] | French: | Tête d'enregistrement à jet d'encre à dispositif piézoélectrique et son procédé de fabrication | [1998/46] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 27.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 21.03.2007 | NL | 21.03.2007 | SE | 21.06.2007 | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/12] | NL | 21.03.2007 | |
SE | 21.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0408306 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) |